CA SB538 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Set for hearing May 10.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 10 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6222 of, and to add Sections 6307 and 6308 to, the Family Code, and to amend Section 18121 of, to add Section 18123 to, and to repeal and add Section 18122 of, the Penal Code, relating to restraining orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic violence and gun violence restraining orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2021-04-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-04-08SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-04-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 6).
2021-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 6.
2021-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code6222Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code6307New CodeSee Bill Text
Family Code6308New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code18121Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18123New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback