CA SB533 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 717, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 717, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 53084.5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Cities and counties: sales and use tax agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB533 Pan Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Assembly - SB 533 Pan Senate Third Reading By MCCARTY (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB533 Pan (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Assembly - SB 533 Pan Senate Third Reading By MCCARTY (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB533 Pan (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 717, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2707.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 2697.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 19). |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1018.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 725.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53084.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |