CA SB531 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8557, 8558, 8610, 8611, 8616, 8625, 8630, 8634, 8657.5, and 8685.9 of the Government Code, relating to local emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local emergencies: districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB531 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 531 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Assembly - SB 531 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN Amendment Set #1 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB531 Galgiani (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-14 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-21SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5566.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6397.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-13AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-13AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6256.)
2018-06-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2017-07-05AssemblyJuly 5 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-21AssemblyJune 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1147.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenatePublished May 16 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1006.) (May 9).
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 9.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback