CA SB530 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17021 of, and to add Section 17021.8 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Employee housing: agricultural employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 17021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 17021.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB530 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB530 |