CA SB53 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 504, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 504, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1708.88 to the Civil Code, relating to unsolicited images.
Title
Unsolicited images.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB53 Leyva et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 53 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB53 Leyva et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 53 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB53 Leyva et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 504, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4933.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5941.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | June 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2842.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Leyva. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator McGuire. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 940.) (April 27). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 518.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 16. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1708.88 | New Code | See Bill Text |