CA SB529 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.6 (commencing with Section 42391) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Recycling: fast food facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 565.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42391 | New Code | See Bill Text |