CA SB526 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65080 of the Government Code, and to add Section 75132 to the Public Resources Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional transportation plans: greenhouse gas emissions: State Mobility Action Plan for Healthy Communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - [04-23-2019] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 774.) (April 22).
2019-04-22SenateApril 22 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 656.) (April 9).
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 550.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-08SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ., TRANS., and HOUSING.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14530.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65080Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code75132New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback