CA SB526 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 7514.6 to the Government Code, relating to public employees' retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees' retirement: final compensation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-31 Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2011-04-28 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-04-12 Set for hearing May 2.
2011-03-24 Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2011-03-21 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2011-03-03 Referred to Com. on RLS.
2011-02-18 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2011-02-17 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code7514.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback