CA SB523 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 39719.4 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Schoolbus replacement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | April 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 732.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39719.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 9552 | Amended Code | Citation Text |