CA SB522 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - March 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 148.11 to the Penal Code, relating to malicious communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal law: schools: malicious communication.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateMarch 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-03SenateSet for hearing March 23.
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code148.11New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback