CA SB522 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 22826 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 20899.5 and 31485.7 of, and to repeal Sections 20909, 31486.35, and 31658 of, the Government Code, relating to public employees' retirement.
Title
Public employees' retirement: additional service credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Dutton [R] | Asm. Martin Garrick [R] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Asm. Diane Harkey [R] |
Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] | Asm. Allan Mansoor [R] | Sen. Sharon Runner [R] | Asm. Jim Silva [R] |
Sen. Mimi Walters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-28 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-03-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22826 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20899.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20909 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31485.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31486.35 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31658 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |