CA SB52 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-27 - Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
Pending: Assembly Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-27 - Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
Pending: Assembly Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21178, 21180, 21181, 21183, 21185, 21187, and 21189.2 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Environmental quality: jobs and economic improvement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB52 Steinberg (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB52 Steinberg (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB52 Steinberg (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB52 Steinberg (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-27 | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 18). | |
2012-06-04 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and J., E.D. & E. | |
2012-02-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-01-31 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 24. Noes 4. Page 2742.) Amended pursuant to Joint Rule 23.5. (Page 2742.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2742.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-01-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-13 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-01-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2638.) (January 11). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-01-05 | Set for hearing January 11. | |
2012-01-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2011-05-02 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 853.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-04-14 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2011-01-03 | Read first time. | |
2010-12-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 15. | |
2010-12-15 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21178 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21187 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |