CA SB513 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.6 (commencing with Section 50535) to Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to shelters for vulnerable populations.
Title
Homeless and domestic violence shelters grants: pets and veterinary services.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] |
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Asm. Lori Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB513 Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB513 Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2805.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2795.) (January 20). |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Set for hearing January 20. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-12-28 | Senate | Set for hearing January 5 in HOUSING pending receipt. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50535 | New Code | See Bill Text |