CA SB511 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 205 of, and to add Section 203.5 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, and to add Section 2214 to the Elections Code, relating to voters.
Title
Voter file maintenance: information from potential jurors.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Sen. Melissa Melendez [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | March 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 203.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2214 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB511 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB511#99INT |