CA SB511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2270 of the Elections Code, relating to voter registration.
Title
California New Motor Voter Program: implementation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-23-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | April 23 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5. Page 806.) Reconsideration granted. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and TRANS. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |