CA SB510 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend and renumber Sections 4127.8 and 4127.9 of, and to repeal Section 4127.7 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacies: compounding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 510 Stone Senate Third Reading By WALDRON (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB510 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-14SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-08SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3032.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-22AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-06-22AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-03-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-03-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 546.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-03-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 488.) (March 27).
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback