CA SB51 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 31).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17059.2 and 23689 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Competes tax credit: refunds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB51 Hertzberg et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 31).
2020-08-31AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2020-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-30AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2020-08-30AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-30AssemblyJoint Rule 61(b)(17) suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 5275.)
2020-08-30AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-30AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2020-08-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 78 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 5271.)
2019-09-09AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2019-09-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-08-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & F. and B. & P.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1180.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1088.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 845.) (April 24).
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 546.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2019-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-20SenateApril 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-08SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and GOV. & F.
2019-01-07SenateRead first time.
2018-12-05SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 4.
2018-12-04SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17059.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code23689Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback