CA SB5 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 41202.6 to the Education Code, to add Part 4 (commencing with Section 55900) to Division 2 of Title 5 of, and to add Division 6 (commencing with Section 62300) to Title 6 of, the Government Code, and to add Section 97.68.1 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government finance.
Title
Affordable Housing and Community Development Investment Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB5 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 5 Beall Senate Third Reading By Mullin (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB5 Beall et al (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - [03-20-2019] set for [Second] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 5 Beall Senate Third Reading By Mullin (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB5 Beall et al (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - [03-20-2019] set for [Second] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2845.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3313.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 1362.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1086.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | April 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 551.) (April 2). |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 384.) (March 20). |
2019-03-20 | Senate | March 20 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 41202.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 55900 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 97.68.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |