CA SB5 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 852, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 5096.611 and 75089.5 to, and to add Division 45 (commencing with Section 80000) to, the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 79772.5 to the Water Code, relating to a drought, water, parks, climate, coastal protection, and outdoor access for all program, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Drought, Water, Parks, Climate, Coastal Protection, and Outdoor Access For All Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-16 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB5 De León Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 5 De León Third Reading Urgency By GARCIA, E (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB5 De León et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 852, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
2017-09-16SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3020.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-16SenateUnanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file.
2017-09-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-15AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 3528.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-14AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-09-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (September 12).
2017-09-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-09-11AssemblySeptember 11 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-09-11AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2017-09-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (August 31).
2017-08-28AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2017-07-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1277.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1175.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-09SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-20SenateApril 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-17SenateApril 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-28SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 444.) (March 22).
2017-03-17SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2017-03-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 322.) (March 7).
2017-03-01SenateSet for hearing March 7.
2017-02-28SenateMarch 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-02-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-02-13SenateSet for hearing March 14.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code5096.611New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code75089.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code80000New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code79772.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback