CA SB5 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 44259 of the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Teacher credentialing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB5 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - SB5 Padilla Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB5 Padilla (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - SB5 Padilla Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB5 Padilla (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1853.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2509.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2480.) |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 948.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 785.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44259 | Amended Code | Citation Text |