CA SB498 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 628, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 628, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 43018.8 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 25724 to the Public Resources Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Vehicle fleets: zero-emission vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB498 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 498 Skinner Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB498 Skinner (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 498 Skinner Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB498 Skinner (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 628, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2927.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3271.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and A. & A.R. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1329.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1185.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 784.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 627.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | March 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43018.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25724 | New Code | See Bill Text |