CA SB498 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 27, 101, and 149 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 94800.5, 94806, 94807, 94820, 94875, 94876, 94877, 94878, 94909, 94910, 94911, 94936, 94937, and 95000 of, to repeal Section 94884 of, and to repeal and add Section 94803 of, the Education Code, relating to private postsecondary education.
Title
Bureau for Private Postsecondary Education:
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94800.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94803 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 94806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94820 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94875 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94876 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94877 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94878 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94884 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94909 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94911 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94936 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94937 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 95000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_498&sess=1112&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_498_bill_20110217_introduced.html |