CA SB496 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2782.8 of the Civil Code, relating to indemnity.
Title
Indemnity: design professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Assembly - SB 496 Cannella Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB496 Cannella et al (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB496 Cannella et al (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-04-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1118.) |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 707.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 709.) (April 17). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 664.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Published April 6 at 4 a.m. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 488.) (March 27). |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2782.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |