CA SB490 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 204.11 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wages: Barbering and Cosmetology Act: licensees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-05 - Senate - Special Consent SB490 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 490 Bradford Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB490 Bradford (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-05SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2479.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2838.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-07-03AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
2017-06-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2017-06-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-04-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 871.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-31SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code204.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code51Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback