CA SB49 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 25402 and 25402.11 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy efficiency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB49 Skinner (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 843.) (April 24).
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 650.) (April 10).
2019-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-20SenateRe-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ.
2019-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25402Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25402.11Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback