CA SB49 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-12 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-12 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Title 24 (commencing with Section 120000) of the Government Code, relating to state prerogative.
Title
California Environmental, Public Health, and Workers Defense Act of 2017.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] |
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-08 - Assembly - SB 49 De León Senate Third Reading By STONE Amendment Set #1 (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB49 De León et al (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB49 De León et al (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 25. Page 3072.) |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 11). |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M., NAT. RES., and JUD. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 1254.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1177.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 851.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 622.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 363.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W., EQ., and JUD. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 120000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 42506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |