CA SB489 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 240, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 240, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4610 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation: change of physician.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB489 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Assembly - SB 489 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB489 Bradford (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Assembly - SB 489 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB489 Bradford (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 240, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2232.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2634.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 801.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 4603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |