CA SB489 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 419, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 419, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 17 (commencing with Section 25259) to Chapter 6.5 of Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Hazardous waste: photovoltaic modules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Senate - Special Consent #9 SB489 Monning (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 489 Monning Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB489 Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 489 Monning Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB489 Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 419, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2378.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2628.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Holden. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 881.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 779.) (April 27). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25259 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42030 | New Code | See Bill Text |