CA SB489 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2827 and 2827.10 of, and to repeal Sections 2827.5 and 2827.9 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: net energy metering.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB489 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-29 - Assembly - SB 489 Wolk Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB489 Wolk (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-29 - Assembly - SB 489 Wolk Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB489 Wolk (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2160.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-29 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 2635.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 17). | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-30 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1275.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1118.) (May 26). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-25 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 808.) (April 28). | |
2011-03-15 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2827.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2827.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2827.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |