CA SB488 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 833, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1722, 1751.5, 15001, 15008, 15010, 15011, 15013, 15017, 15020, 15027, 15027.1, 15028, 15031, 15036, 15053, 15056, 15060, and 15062 of, to add Sections 15009.1 and 15059.2 to, to repeal Section 15015 of, and to repeal and add Section 15016 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public insurance adjusters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-29 - Senate - Special Consent SB488 Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 488 Block Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 488 Block Senate Third Reading By HEALTH Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB488 Block (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 833, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2016-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2016-08-29SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5495.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2016-08-24SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2016-08-22SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2016-08-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6011.) Ordered to the Senate.
2016-08-19AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5949.) Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-01AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
2016-06-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2016-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
2016-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2016-05-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2016-04-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2016-01-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2016-01-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2943.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-01-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-01-19SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2016-01-14SenateSet for hearing January 19.
2016-01-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2896.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-01-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2016-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 13.
2015-04-21SenateApril 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-03-27SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2015-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on INS.
2015-02-27SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
2015-02-26SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code14000Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14001Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14020Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14022Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14022.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14024Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14025Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14025.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code14027Repealed CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14028Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14030Repealed CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14031Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14032Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14037Repealed CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14038Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14039Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14040Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14042Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14061Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14063Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14064Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14079New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code14080Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14090.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14097Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code14099Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15001Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15008Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15009.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code15010Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15011Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15013Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15015Repealed CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15017Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15020Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15027Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15027.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15028Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15031Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15036Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15053Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15056Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15059.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code15060Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code15062Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1722Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1751.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_488&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_bill_20150226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_bill_20160104_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_bill_20160517_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_bill_20160616_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_bill_20160819_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_bill_20160902_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_bill_20160929_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_vote_20160113_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_vote_20160125_0302PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_vote_20160622_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_vote_20160629_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_vote_20160819_0945AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_vote_20160822_0210PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_488_vote_20160829_0507PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback