CA SB487 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 228.5 of the Water Code, relating to water resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Water Resources: aerial snow survey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB487 Caballero (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1270.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1100.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-22SenateApril 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-03-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 439.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing March 26.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code228.5Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback