CA SB486 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7099.2 and 7124.6 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Contractors’ State License Law: letter of admonishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 486 Monning Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB486 Monning et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB486 Monning et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2853.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1075.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 746.) (April 18). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 488.) (March 27). |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7099.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7124.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |