CA SB486 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14526 and 14526.5 of, to add Sections 14524.3, 14524.4, 14526.4, and 14526.6 to, and to repeal Section 14009 of, the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Department of Transportation: goals and performance measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB486 DeSaulnier Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 486 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB486 DeSaulnier (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 486 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB486 DeSaulnier (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Set for hearing August 27. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6283.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 5108.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel PĂ©rez. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and A. & A.R. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and TRANS. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1105.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1015.) (May 23). |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 759.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 465.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and T. & H. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13985 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14009 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14523.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14524.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14524.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14525.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14526 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14526.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14536 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 98 | New Code | See Bill Text |