CA SB485 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 611, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 611, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18502 and 18540 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: election worker protections.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB485 Becker Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 485 Becker Senate Third Reading By Pellerin (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB485 Becker (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 485 Becker Senate Third Reading By Pellerin (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB485 Becker (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 611, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 7. Page 2838.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2770.) |
2023-09-12 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2683.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2023-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 3289.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (September 1). |
2023-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 11). |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and PUB. S. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1346.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1172.) (May 18). |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 853.) (April 24). |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 571.) (March 29). |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 18502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 18540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |