CA SB484 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2025.325 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to depositions.
Title
Deposition reporting services: unlawful business practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB484 Roth (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Assembly | June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 803.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 746.) (April 18). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 8008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 2025.325 | New Code | See Bill Text |