CA SB48 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 740.1 of, and to add Section 740.12 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities: research and development projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB48 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB48 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1042.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 30). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2012-12-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 19. |
2012-12-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 740.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 854 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 854.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |