CA SB48 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 51204.5, 51500, 51501, 60040, and 60044 of the Education Code, relating to instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: prohibition of discriminatory content.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-07-05 - Assembly - SB 48 Leno Senate Third Reading By AMMIANO (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB48 Leno (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2011.
2011-07-13 Approved by the Governor.
2011-07-07 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2011-07-05 In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2011-07-05 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 2189.) Ordered to the Senate.
2011-06-27 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-06-23 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 22).
2011-04-28 Referred to Com. on ED.
2011-04-14 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-04-14 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 651.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-04-07 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-04-06 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 559.) (April 5).
2011-03-29 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Set for hearing April 5.
2011-03-23 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 426.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-03-10 Set for hearing March 23.
2011-03-09 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-03-08 Set for hearing March 16.
2011-01-20 Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
2011-01-03 Read first time.
2010-12-14 From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 13.
2010-12-13 Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_48&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_48_bill_20101213_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_48_bill_20110329_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_48_bill_20110706_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_48_bill_20110714_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_48_vote_20110323_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_48_vote_20110405_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_48_vote_20110414_1018AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_48_vote_20110622_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_48_vote_20110705_0137PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback