CA SB478 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 66722.2 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: transfer of community college students to the California State University or University of California.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB478 Portantino Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SB 478 Portantino Senate Third Reading By MEDINA (Y: 70 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB478 Portantino (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-15SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 1).
2017-07-19AssemblyJuly 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11).
2017-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1328.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1185.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-17SenateApril 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-04-04SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 536.) (March 29).
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66722.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback