CA SB478 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 490, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 490, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 11166.02 of the Penal Code, and to add and repeal Section 10612.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child abuse.
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect Reporting Act: mandated reporters: pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB478 Huff Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Assembly - SB 478 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB478 Huff (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Assembly - SB 478 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB478 Huff (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 490, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2443.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2813.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2015-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)) |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1255.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1154.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 595.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11166.02 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10612.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |