CA SB478 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to food safety.
Title
Food safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_478&sess=1112&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0451-0500/sb_478_bill_20110217_introduced.html |