CA SB47 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2016 (Chapter 23 of the Statutes of 2016) by amending Items 9800-001-0001, 9800-001-0494, and 9800-001-0988 of Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Assembly - SB 47 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB47 Committee On B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB47 Committee On B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-03-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 564.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 22. Noes 5.) (March 2). |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 218.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5. Page 171.) (February 9). |
2017-02-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Set for hearing February 9. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |