CA SB468 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 535, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 535, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 103 and 149.10 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Department of Transportation: north coast corridor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB468 Kehoe Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 468 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB468 Kehoe (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 468 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB468 Kehoe (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 535, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-09 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2450.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-08 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 3042.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-31 | Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a vote was taken. Read third time and amended. (Page 2710.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-17 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-06-20 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1240.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1117.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-25 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-13 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-09 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 864.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-04-14 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 619.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-04-04 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-03-31 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and T. & H. | |
2011-03-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-03-15 | Set for hearing April 5. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and N.R. & W. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 149.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |