CA SB463 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3160 and 3183 of, and to add Sections 3181.5 and 3186.3 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to natural gas storage wells.
Title
Natural gas storage wells: well stimulation treatments: chemical composition: leaks: regulation.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB463 Stern Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 463 Stern Senate Third Reading By Smith (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB463 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 463 Stern Senate Third Reading By Smith (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB463 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 2837.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 3205.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 8). |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1276.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1100.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 844.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3181.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3186.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |