CA SB462 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 462, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 462, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 827.12 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: case files: access.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB462 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 462 Atkins Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB462 Atkins (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 462 Atkins Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB462 Atkins (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 462, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2584.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2963.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 852.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 787 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 827.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |