CA SB462 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 56502 of, and to add Chapter 4.2 (commencing with Section 56395) to Part 30 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to special education.
Title
Special education: special education advocates:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-31 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-26 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 760.) (April 27). | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 56395 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 56502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |