CA SB460 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on August 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on August 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12119 to the Public Contract Code, relating to the Internet.
Title
Communications: broadband Internet access service: state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 460 De León Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 28 N: 37 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB460 De León (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB460 De León (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 27). |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (August 22). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 6414.) |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 61(b)(13,14,15,16) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6302.) |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | June 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 4106.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4083.) (January 24). |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Set for hearing January 24. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4071.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4055.) (January 18). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Set for hearing January 11. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | April 4 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1775 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 12119 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 12121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5980 | New Code | See Bill Text |