CA SB460 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 667, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 667, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 125055 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Prenatal testing program: education.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB460 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 460 Pavley Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB460 Pavley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 460 Pavley Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB460 Pavley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 667, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2290.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2999.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 13). |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1166.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 791.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 125055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |