CA SB46 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8593.3 and 8593.4 of, and to add Section 8593.5 to, the Government Code, and to add Section 910.9 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to state government.
Title
Emergency services: telecommunications.
Sponsors
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 841.) (April 24). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 331.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HUMAN S. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8593.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8593.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8593.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 910.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |