CA SB46 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 801.1 of the Penal Code, relating to statutes of limitation.
Title
Sex offenders: commencing trial: time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2010-01-13 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 2665.) | |
2009-12-17 | Set for hearing January 12. | |
2009-12-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-04-21 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. | |
2009-04-02 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-02-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-01-29 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-01-08 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 7. | |
2009-01-07 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |