CA SB459 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 16642 of, and to add Section 7513.73 to, the Government Code, relating to public employee retirement systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employee retirement systems: prohibited investments: retailers and wholesalers of banned weapons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Employees, Retirement, and Social Security] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB459 Portantino (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20AssemblyJune 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-05-31AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4113.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-23SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4055.) (January 18).
2018-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2018-01-16SenateJanuary 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-10SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4006.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-04SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2018-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-03SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-04-24SenateApril 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-04-06SenateApril 25 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-03-02SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code5442.12New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code16642Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code7513.73New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code26720Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback